Case: 03-98-00212-CR
03-98-00212-CR
04/27/1998
Theft
Eric Ralls
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/20/2001 | Case stored | | |||||
10/04/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
06/17/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
02/18/1999 | Submitted | | |||||
02/18/1999 | Submission | | |||||
02/05/1999 | Brief filed | | |||||
01/27/1999 | Submission | | |||||
12/31/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
11/17/1998 | Brief filed | | |||||
11/17/1998 | Brief received, not filed | | |||||
10/01/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
09/28/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
08/27/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
08/26/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
07/29/1998 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||
07/15/1998 | Letter received | | |||||
07/15/1998 | Notice received | | |||||
07/10/1998 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
06/30/1998 | Clerk's Record Overdue | | |||||
06/22/1998 | Response received | | |||||
06/17/1998 | Response received | | |||||
06/09/1998 | Docketing statement to appellant's counsel | | |||||
06/09/1998 | Response requested (postcard) | | |||||
05/26/1998 | Notice received | | |||||
04/27/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||||
04/27/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/04/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Mr. Charles R. Kimbrough |
State Prosecuting Attorney | Interested party | The Honorable Matthew W. Paul |
Ralls, Eric | Appellant | Mr. John T. Floyd III |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1
Caldwell
Honorable Edward L. Jarrett
24,361
365 days/$2000 (PROBATED)