Case: PD-0568-95
PD-0568-95
05/19/1995
PDR Case Type
THOMAS, TAMMY LYNN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/04/1996 | BRIEF FILED | State | |
11/01/1995 | BRIEF FILED | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/22/1996 | PUBLISH MOTION TO | DENIED | |
04/19/1996 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process | | |
04/19/1996 | MANDATE ISSD | | |
04/15/1996 | PUBLISH MOTION TO | Filed | |
04/03/1996 | OPINION ISSD | Reversed COA & Trial Court;Remanded to Trial Court | |
04/03/1996 | OPINION ISSD | Reversed COA & Trial Court;Remanded to Trial Court | |
02/07/1996 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process | | |
02/07/1996 | SUBMITTED | | |
01/04/1996 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process | | |
01/04/1996 | BRIEF FILED | | |
01/04/1996 | SET FOR SUBMIS | | |
11/30/1995 | EXT BRIEF DISP | Granted | |
11/30/1995 | EXT BRIEF FILED | | |
11/01/1995 | BRIEF FILED | | |
10/04/1995 | PDR GRANTED | | |
10/04/1995 | PDR DISP | Granted | |
10/04/1995 | PDR DISP | Granted | |
06/20/1995 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
05/19/1995 | PDR FILED | | |
05/19/1995 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/09/1999 | STORED | CASE STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John C. Vance |
THOMAS, TAMMY LYNN | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Robert Ford |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-93-01929-CR
AFF 2-28-95
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 5 of Dallas County
Dallas
Honorable TOM FULLER
MB9347859F