Case Information: 29793 | |||
Short Caption: | GORT METALS VS. SIIS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A334052 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/12/2000 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/06/1997 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100.00 from McGroarty and Lane-check no.12978 | ||
01/06/1997 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant. | ||
01/08/1997 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. To Court Reporter: Anita Springs-Walker. | ||
01/21/1997 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | ||
01/24/1997 | Other | Other. Filed Certificate of Acknowledgment from Anita M. Springs, Court Recorder of the Eighth Judicial District court, Dept. XI. | ||
01/31/1997 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Supplemental Request for Transcript. To Court Reporter: Anita Springs-Walker. | ||
05/09/1997 | Brief | Filed Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. Mailed 5/7/97. | ||
05/09/1997 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appellant's Volume 1. Mailed 5/7/97. | ||
06/09/1997 | Brief | Filed Brief. State Industrial Insurance System Answer Brief. | ||
06/09/1997 | Brief | Filed Brief. State Industrial Insurance System's Appendix to Answer Brief. | ||
07/09/1997 | Brief | Filed Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. No postmark. | ||
09/10/1997 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. | ||
04/12/2000 | Case Status Update | Resubmitted for Decision. Panel: NNP99B--CY/DA/ML. | ||
07/07/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-11554 | |
08/01/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-13285 | |
08/01/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/07/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Leave for Late Filing of Petition for Rehearing of Panel Decision Pursuant to NRAP 40(a) and Motion to Recall Remittitur. | 00-13670 | |
08/07/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from J. Michael McGroarty-check no. 17438. | ||
08/23/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 8, 2000. 11/07/00 ORDER: REMITTITUR RECALLED--FILED PETITION FOR REHEARING. | 00-13285 | |
11/07/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. On July 7, 2000, this court entered an order dismissing this appeal. On August 1, 2000, the remittitur was issued and the court's jurisdiction over this appeal came to an end. On August 7, 2000, appellant filed a motion for leave to file an untimely petition for rehearing and to recall the remittitur. Because this court prefers not to impute to a client the neglect of his or her counsel, we grant appellant's motion. We hereby recall the remittitur, and direct the clerk of this court to file the petition for rehearing provisionally received on August 7, 2000. | 00-19565 | |
11/07/2000 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Petition for Rehearing of Panel Decision pursuant to NRAP 40(a). | 00-13673 | |
12/26/2000 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-22391 | |
01/09/2001 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Mailed on: January 5, 2001. | 01-00500 | |
01/09/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. Motion to Stay Remittitur. | 01-00501 | |
01/16/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Order Staying issuance of Remittitur. We grant the motion and stay issuance of the remittitur pending our resolution of appellant's petition. | 01-00943 | |
02/02/2001 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. We have reviewed the petition, and we conclude that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. " . . . we deny the petition." fn1[We vacate the court's order filed January 16, 2001, which stayed issuance of the remittitur pending our resolution of this petition.] En Banc. | 01-02226 | |
02/21/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-02384 | |
02/21/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/20/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 1, 2001. | 01-02384 |