Case: 11-90-00273-CV
11-90-00273-CV
11/30/1990
Contract
Collum, Carl et al
City of Abilene
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/06/1993 | Mandate issued | | |
12/17/1992 | Case returned from higher court | | |
11/11/1992 | Opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied | |
06/17/1992 | Application for writ of error disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/06/1992 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |
03/04/1992 | Application fee paid | | |
03/04/1992 | Application for writ of error | | |
03/04/1992 | Express fee paid | | |
01/30/1992 | Mot. - For rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
01/27/1992 | Response to motion, brief, etc. filed | | |
01/17/1992 | Mot. - For rehearing filed | | |
12/31/1991 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/13/1991 | Submitted | | |
06/13/1991 | Submission set in Eastland | | |
06/12/1991 | Additonal Authorities | | |
03/28/1991 | Submission set in Eastland | | |
03/22/1991 | Brief filed | | |
03/22/1991 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/22/1991 | Record checked in | | |
03/11/1991 | Supp. TR filed | | |
02/26/1991 | Record checked in | | |
02/26/1991 | Record checked out | | |
02/25/1991 | Brief filed | | |
02/19/1991 | Record checked out | | |
01/24/1991 | Exhibits filed | | |
01/24/1991 | Mot. - To file disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/24/1991 | SF filed | | |
01/14/1991 | Motion filing fee paid | | |
01/14/1991 | Mot. - For leave/permission to file late article | | |
01/08/1991 | SF received | | |
12/13/1990 | Mot. - Ext. time to file SF disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/10/1990 | Motion filing fee paid | | |
12/05/1990 | Filing fee paid | | |
12/03/1990 | Mot. - Ext. time to file SF | | |
12/03/1990 | Motion fee requested | | |
11/30/1990 | Filing fee not paid - possible dismissal | | |
11/30/1990 | TR filed | | |
11/30/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/06/1993 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
City Of Abilene | Appellee | Harvey Cargill Jr. Susan M. Yantis Claudia Evans Clinton |
Collum, Davila Johnson, Et Al | Appellant | B. Craig Deats |
Trial Court Information
350th District Court
Taylor
Honorable John T Forbis
2391-D