Case: 05-03-00150-CR
05-03-00150-CR
01/31/2003
Other Felony
Edwards, Andre Perez
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/29/2005 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/29/2005 | Mandate Issued | | |
02/15/2005 | Record Returned | | |
02/07/2005 | Motion for Leave to File | Motion or Writ Denied | |
01/19/2005 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | |
10/18/2004 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
10/13/2004 | File Received by Court of Criminal Appeals | | |
10/11/2004 | Record Shipped | | |
10/07/2004 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
08/12/2004 | Ext to file Petition for Discretionary Review Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/19/2004 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
07/19/2004 | Record Retention | Retain | |
07/19/2004 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/21/2004 | Submitted | | |
04/21/2004 | Submission | | |
04/21/2004 | Submitted | | |
03/31/2004 | Brief Due | | |
03/23/2004 | Brief Filed | | |
03/12/2004 | Brief Due | | |
03/11/2004 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/09/2004 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
03/07/2004 | Supplemental Record Due | | |
02/24/2004 | Submission | | |
02/11/2004 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/11/2004 | Brief Filed | | |
02/11/2004 | Case reinstated | | |
02/11/2004 | Order Entered | Vacated | |
02/11/2004 | Case reinstated | | |
02/09/2004 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
02/09/2004 | Brief Received | | |
02/06/2004 | Order Entered | Abated | |
02/06/2004 | Order Entered | Abated | |
01/30/2004 | Brief Due | | |
12/31/2003 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/29/2003 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
11/12/2003 | Brief Due | | |
10/16/2003 | Brief Due | | |
10/13/2003 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
10/13/2003 | Court Reporter Record Due | | |
09/19/2003 | Case reinstated | | |
09/19/2003 | Order Entered | Otherwise Disposed | |
09/19/2003 | Order Entered | Vacated | |
09/19/2003 | Case reinstated | | |
09/18/2003 | Response due | | |
09/16/2003 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
09/08/2003 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
08/29/2003 | Supplemental Record Due | | |
07/30/2003 | Order Entered | Abated | |
07/30/2003 | Order Entered | Abated | |
04/30/2003 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
04/21/2003 | 25.2 Certification filed | | |
04/14/2003 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
04/11/2003 | Record due | | |
02/06/2003 | No 25.2 certificate | | |
01/31/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
01/31/2003 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
01/31/2003 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
01/06/2003 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
01/06/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
12/12/2002 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/29/2005 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Andre Perez Edwards | Criminal - Appellant | John G Tatum |
Sandra A. Hughes | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Sandra Hughes |
Thomas Mullins | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Thomas Mullins |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | William T. (Bill) Hill, Jr. Kristin C. Hagge |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Dallas
Honorable Janice L. Warder
F01-74581-H
Life