Case: D-0963
D-0963
04/15/1991
application for writ of error granted by Court
DAN BOYLES JR.
SUSAN LEIGH KERR
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/10/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/09/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
05/28/1993 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | behalf of Walter Wolfram # 21871000, 1060 Amarillo National Bank Plaza Two, Amarillo, Tx 79101 (806) 372-3449 | |
05/21/1993 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | Received (instead of filed) | by Michael Curry of Bragg, Chumlea, McQuality, Smithers & Curry, 101 E 9th, Suite 1005, Austin, TX in behalf of petitioner. 512/474-5573 | |
03/17/1993 | Letter brief | Petitioner | Letter from Pet's attorney Barry Casnoff response to Respondent's motion to reargue | |
03/09/1993 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | of Gibbins, Winckler & Harvey, Attys Bob Gibbins & Steve Gibbins, P. O. Box 1452, Austin, TX 78767, 512/474-2441, FX 512/482-8303 | |
03/05/1993 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | Behalf of John Nichols #1499600, 1400 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 600, Houston, Tx 77056 (713) 966-4444 | |
03/04/1993 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | Received (instead of filed) | Addendum to Amicus Brief of 02-08-93 on behalf of Women & The Law Section by Terese M. Easter, 714 Jackson St., Ste. 480, Dallas, TX 75202 214/653-1653 | |
02/12/1993 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | Received (instead of filed) | from Fred Hagans(amicus) to Barry Chasnoff (counsel for pet) | |
02/08/1993 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | on behalf of Women and the Law Section of the State Bar of Texas by Ralph Brock, P.O. Box 959, Lubbock, TX 79408-0959 806/762-5671 | |
02/03/1993 | Letter brief | Petitioner | Petitioners dispute all three propositions raised by Respondent | |
01/29/1993 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | Received (instead of filed) | Association of Women Attorneys; Elizabeth Asher, 2615 Waugh Drive, Suite 265, Houston, Texas 77006 (713)228-4005 | |
01/25/1993 | Reply Brief | Respondent | "Susan Kerr's response to Dan Boyles' Letter Response to Susan Kerr's Motion For Rehearing" | |
01/13/1993 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | Petitioner's motion for rehearing of cause filed | Letter response to Motion for Rehearing behalf of Dan Boyles | |
01/11/1993 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | Received (instead of filed) | Behalf of Michael Curry; 101 East 9th Street, Suite 1005, Austin, Tx 78701 (512) 474-5573 | |
12/18/1992 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | Behalf of William Hagans #0865500 & Pat Tulinski # 20283485; Hagans & Assoc., 2700 Texas Commerce Tower, 600 Travis, Houston, TX 77002 (713) 222-2700 | |
12/18/1992 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | Received (instead of filed) | on behalf of Michael Curry, 101 E. 9th St., Suite 1005 Austin, Tx. 78701 512/474-5573 | |
12/16/1992 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | on behalf of Women's Advocacy Project by Paula Pierce, P.O. Box 684486, Austin Texas 78768-4486 512/476-0882 | |
12/16/1992 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | on behalf of John H. Holloway, 926 N. Wilcrest Dr., Houston, Tx. 77079 713/464-9264 | |
12/16/1992 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filed | | |
12/15/1992 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | Received (instead of filed) | of Atty Philip K. Maxwell, Longley & Maxwell, 1609 Shoal Creek Boulevard, Suite 100, Austin, Texas 78701, 512/477-4444, | |
10/02/1992 | Reply to Amicus Curiae Brief | Respondent | reply to amicus of Phillips Petroleum Company | |
09/18/1992 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | of Phillips Petroleum Company, Atty Reagan Wm. Simpson, Roger Townsend, Fulbright & Jaworski*1301 McKinney Ste 5100*Houston TX 77010-3095*713/651-5151 | |
08/18/1992 | Post submission brief filed | Petitioner | containing post-submission authorities | |
06/19/1992 | Letter brief | Petitioner | | |
04/10/1992 | Post submission brief filed | Respondent | | |
04/03/1992 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | Behalf of Texas Assoc. of Defense Counsel att. P. Michael Jung #11054600 Strasburger & Price, 4300 NationsBank Plaza, 901 Main St. LB. 175, Dallas, Tx | |
01/31/1992 | Letter brief | Petitioner | Attorney Barry A. Casnoff would want to bring to the Court's attention the opinion of the 13th C.O.A. in case styled Casas V. Wornick Co. | |
01/30/1992 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | of Texas Civil Justice League, Atty Jerry B. Donaldson, 100 Congress Avenue, Suite 100, Austin TX 78701, 499-6690 | |
01/17/1992 | Post submission brief filed | Petitioner | | |
01/17/1992 | Reply to Amicus Curiae Brief | Petitioner | incorporated w/post-submission brief | |
11/27/1991 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | of Texas Women's Political Caucus, Atty-Kathleen D. Teal, P. O. Box 163, Austin, TX 78767, 512/326-2282 | |
07/09/1991 | Reply Brief | Respondent | response to request by "A Current Affair" for a copy of videotape, incorporated with motion to seal videotape. | |
04/15/1991 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
04/15/1991 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/10/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/09/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
06/29/1993 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate date of a process | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive mandate date. | | |
06/29/1993 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate date of a process | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive mandate date. | | |
06/29/1993 | list missing briefs when case is separated(remarks | 2 Vol S/F Missing; Orig of amicus br filed 3/4/93--Women & Law Sect.--missing | | |
06/29/1993 | Mandate issued | 855 SW2d 593 | | |
05/28/1993 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | behalf of Walter Wolfram # 21871000, 1060 Amarillo National Bank Plaza Two, Amarillo, Tx 79101 (806) 372-3449 | | |
05/21/1993 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | by Michael Curry of Bragg, Chumlea, McQuality, Smithers & Curry, 101 E 9th, Suite 1005, Austin, TX in behalf of petitioner. 512/474-5573 | | |
05/07/1993 | Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See Remarks | TO ALL AMICI/CURIAE TRANSMITTING COMPLIMENTARY OPINION COPIES | | |
05/05/1993 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Overruled | RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO RE-ARGUE IS OVERRULED | |
05/05/1993 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
05/05/1993 | Opinion issued | judgment of the coa reversed, remanded to tc | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
05/05/1993 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | | |
05/05/1993 | Concurring Opinion issued. | ON REHEARING BY J.GONZALEZ | | |
05/05/1993 | Dissenting opinion issued. | SUPP DISS OP ON MO/RE BY J.DOGGETT JOINED BY JJ.GAMMAGE AND SPECTOR | | |
05/05/1993 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | RESPONDENT'S MO/RE | |
05/05/1993 | Opinion issued | judgment of the coa reversed, remanded to tc | SUBST MAJ OPN BY C.J.P. F/THAT DEL ON 12/2/92 WCH IS W/D; JUDGMENT UNCHANGED (CONC OP/REH BY J. R.A.G; SUPP DISS OP/MO/RE/LD JOIN/JJ.BG & RS. 855 SW2d 593 | |
05/05/1993 | Opinion issued | judgment of the coa reversed, remanded to tc | SUBST MAJ OPN BY C.J.P. F/THAT DEL ON 12/2/92 WCH IS W/D; JUDGMENT UNCHANGED (CONC OP/REH BY J. R.A.G; SUPP DISS OP/MO/RE/LD JOIN/JJ.BG & RS. 855 SW2d 593 | |
05/05/1993 | Opinion issued | judgment of the coa reversed, remanded to tc | SUBST MAJ OPN BY C.J.P. F/THAT DEL ON 12/2/92 WCH IS W/D; JUDGMENT UNCHANGED (CONC OP/REH BY J. R.A.G; SUPP DISS OP/MO/RE/LD JOIN/JJ.BG & RS. 855 SW2d 593 | |
05/05/1993 | Previous opinion withdrawn | MAJ OP OF 12/2/92 W/D AND OPINION OF THIS DATE SUBSTITUTED; JUDGMENT UNCHANGED (PREV. CON & DIS OPN & DISS OPN DEL 12/2/92 STAND). | | |
03/17/1993 | Letter brief | Letter from Pet's attorney Barry Casnoff response to Respondent's motion to reargue | | |
03/09/1993 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | of Gibbins, Winckler & Harvey, Attys Bob Gibbins & Steve Gibbins, P. O. Box 1452, Austin, TX 78767, 512/474-2441, FX 512/482-8303 | | |
03/05/1993 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Behalf of John Nichols #1499600, 1400 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 600, Houston, Tx 77056 (713) 966-4444 | | |
03/04/1993 | Miscellaneous Motion | motion to reargue | | |
03/04/1993 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | Addendum to Amicus Brief of 02-08-93 on behalf of Women & The Law Section by Terese M. Easter, 714 Jackson St., Ste. 480, Dallas, TX 75202 214/653-1653 | | |
03/03/1993 | Notice requesting filing fee | $10.00 Respondent Susan Kerr's motion to reargue | | |
02/12/1993 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | from Fred Hagans(amicus) to Barry Chasnoff (counsel for pet) | | |
02/08/1993 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | on behalf of Women and the Law Section of the State Bar of Texas by Ralph Brock, P.O. Box 959, Lubbock, TX 79408-0959 806/762-5671 | | |
02/03/1993 | Letter brief | Petitioners dispute all three propositions raised by Respondent | | |
01/29/1993 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | Association of Women Attorneys; Elizabeth Asher, 2615 Waugh Drive, Suite 265, Houston, Texas 77006 (713)228-4005 | | |
01/25/1993 | Reply Brief | "Susan Kerr's response to Dan Boyles' Letter Response to Susan Kerr's Motion For Rehearing" | | |
01/20/1993 | Notice requesting filing fee | rsp reply br - $5.00, call made to office td | | |
01/13/1993 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | Letter response to Motion for Rehearing behalf of Dan Boyles | | |
01/11/1993 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | Behalf of Michael Curry; 101 East 9th Street, Suite 1005, Austin, Tx 78701 (512) 474-5573 | | |
01/08/1993 | Notice requesting filing fee | reply to mo/re - $5.00, call made to office td | | |
12/30/1992 | MET to file reply disposed of | Filing granted | Petitioner's m/e/t reply to mo/re granted to 1/8/93 | |
12/28/1992 | Notice requesting filing fee | M/E/T to file Reply to Mo/Re behalf of Dan Boyles $10.00 call made to office | | |
12/18/1992 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Behalf of William Hagans #0865500 & Pat Tulinski # 20283485; Hagans & Assoc., 2700 Texas Commerce Tower, 600 Travis, Houston, TX 77002 (713) 222-2700 | | |
12/18/1992 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | on behalf of Michael Curry, 101 E. 9th St., Suite 1005 Austin, Tx. 78701 512/474-5573 | | |
12/16/1992 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | on behalf of John H. Holloway, 926 N. Wilcrest Dr., Houston, Tx. 77079 713/464-9264 | | |
12/16/1992 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | on behalf of Women's Advocacy Project by Paula Pierce, P.O. Box 684486, Austin Texas 78768-4486 512/476-0882 | | |
12/16/1992 | Motion for Rehearing | | | |
12/16/1992 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | | | |
12/15/1992 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | of Atty Philip K. Maxwell, Longley & Maxwell, 1609 Shoal Creek Boulevard, Suite 100, Austin, Texas 78701, 512/477-4444, | | |
12/04/1992 | Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record | JUDGMENT/CA REVERSED; CAUSE REMANDED TO TC. | | |
12/02/1992 | Opinion issued | judgment of the coa reversed, remanded to tc | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
12/02/1992 | Concurring and Dissenting Opinion delivered | BY J.COOK | | |
12/02/1992 | Dissenting opinion issued. | BY J.DOGGETT JOINED BY JJ.MAUZY AND GAMMAGE | | |
12/02/1992 | Opinion issued | judgment of the coa reversed, remanded to tc | Op. by C.J.PHILLIPS; CONC & DISS OP. BY J.COOK; DISSENTING OP. BY J.DOGGETT JOINED BY J.MAUZY AND J.GAMMAGE (THIS MAJ OP ONLY W/D 5/5/93) | |
12/02/1992 | Opinion issued | judgment of the coa reversed, remanded to tc | Op. by C.J.PHILLIPS; CONC & DISS OP. BY J.COOK; DISSENTING OP. BY J.DOGGETT JOINED BY J.MAUZY AND J.GAMMAGE (THIS MAJ OP ONLY W/D 5/5/93) | |
12/02/1992 | Opinion issued | judgment of the coa reversed, remanded to tc | Op. by C.J.PHILLIPS; CONC & DISS OP. BY J.COOK; DISSENTING OP. BY J.DOGGETT JOINED BY J.MAUZY AND J.GAMMAGE (THIS MAJ OP ONLY W/D 5/5/93) | |
10/02/1992 | Letter Filed | Petitioners Supplemental Letter brief | | |
10/02/1992 | Reply to Amicus Curiae Brief | reply to amicus of Phillips Petroleum Company | | |
09/28/1992 | Notice requesting filing fee | resp reply to amc - $5.00, call made to office td | | |
09/25/1992 | Notice requesting filing fee | pet's sup ltr br - $5.00, call made to office td | | |
09/18/1992 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | of Phillips Petroleum Company, Atty Reagan Wm. Simpson, Roger Townsend, Fulbright & Jaworski*1301 McKinney Ste 5100*Houston TX 77010-3095*713/651-5151 | | |
08/18/1992 | Post submission brief filed | containing post-submission authorities | | |
08/13/1992 | Notice requesting filing fee | pet's post-sub br - $5.00, call made to office td | | |
06/19/1992 | Letter brief | | | |
06/16/1992 | Notice requesting filing fee | pet supp br - $5.00, call made to office td | | |
04/10/1992 | Post submission brief filed | | | |
04/03/1992 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Behalf of Texas Assoc. of Defense Counsel att. P. Michael Jung #11054600 Strasburger & Price, 4300 NationsBank Plaza, 901 Main St. LB. 175, Dallas, Tx | | |
01/31/1992 | Letter brief | Attorney Barry A. Casnoff would want to bring to the Court's attention the opinion of the 13th C.O.A. in case styled Casas V. Wornick Co. | | |
01/30/1992 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | of Texas Civil Justice League, Atty Jerry B. Donaldson, 100 Congress Avenue, Suite 100, Austin TX 78701, 499-6690 | | |
01/17/1992 | Post submission brief filed | | | |
01/17/1992 | Reply to Amicus Curiae Brief | incorporated w/post-submission brief | | |
01/06/1992 | Notice requesting filing fee | Post Sub Br & Reply To AMC - $10.00, call made to office td | | |
12/03/1991 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission date of a process | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submission info. | | |
12/03/1991 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted date of a process | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submitted date. | | |
12/03/1991 | Oral argument | for pet by Barry A. Chasnoff for resp by Ronald D. Krist | ||
11/27/1991 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | of Texas Women's Political Caucus, Atty-Kathleen D. Teal, P. O. Box 163, Austin, TX 78767, 512/326-2282 | | |
09/11/1991 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Overruled | resp's mo/seal videotape exhibit and the request f/A CURRENT AFFAIR to copy tape are overruled (COURT ORDER ISSUED (PUBLISHED). | |
09/11/1991 | Order of the Court Issued | PUBLISHED COURT ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO COPY VIDEOTAPE BY A CURRENT AFFAIR AND OVERRULING RESP.MO/SEAL VIDEOTAPE. 815 SW2d 545 | | |
07/09/1991 | Miscellaneous Motion | Motion to seal videotape exhibit | | |
07/09/1991 | Letter Filed | | | |
07/09/1991 | Reply Brief | response to request by "A Current Affair" for a copy of videotape, incorporated with motion to seal videotape. | | |
07/03/1991 | Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See Remarks | to attys of record/written request f/reply re A CURRENT AFFAIR | | |
07/03/1991 | Request made for reply to proceeding | fr/attys of record/in 7 days to request fr/A CURRENT AFFAIR | | |
07/02/1991 | Letter Filed | fr/Leila McMurray, Assoc.Producer/A CURRENT AFFAIR - req/cc tape | | |
07/02/1991 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | All attorneys of record notified of letter request/A CURRENT AFFAIR. | | |
06/19/1991 | Motion to Expedite disposed | Overruled | Pet/s mo | |
06/19/1991 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Filing granted | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
06/19/1991 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Filing granted | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
06/19/1991 | Amount of time allotted for oral argument. | 25/25 minutes; 12/03/91 | | |
06/19/1991 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Filing granted | Points 1 thru 24 (all points). | |
06/19/1991 | Set for Submission | December 3, 1991 | | |
06/19/1991 | Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals. | | | |
06/18/1991 | Petitioner's reply brief | | | |
06/11/1991 | Notice requesting filing fee | Pet's Reply Br - $5.00, call made to office td | | |
04/18/1991 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
04/18/1991 | No description available. | | | |
04/15/1991 | Motion to Expedite Filed | Motion for Expedited Consideration of App Writ of Error and Expedited Sub- mission | | |
04/15/1991 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | | |
04/15/1991 | Reply to Response | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
06/29/1993 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
KERR, SUSAN LEIGH | Respondent | Mr. David A. Slaughter Mr. Kevin D. Krist Mr. Ronald D. Krist Mr. Richard R. Morrison Mr. Harvill E. Weller Jr. Mr. Kenneth W. Burch |
BROESCHE, KARL | Other interested party | Mr. James L. Gascoyne |
TAMBORELLO, JOHN PAUL | Other interested party | Ms. Gwen Wiesen Tipton |
BOYLES, JR., DAN | Petitioner | Mr. Barry A. Chasnoff Mr. Stephan B. Rogers Mr. Jaime Drabek Mr. David Crump Ms. Lynne Liberato |
WIDNER, WRAY | Other interested party | Mr. Todd Lonergan |
Court of Appeals Information:
06-90-00064-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
806 SW2d 255, 01-08-91
6th Court of Appeals
Honorable BEN Z. GRANT
Trial Court Information
269th District Court
Harris
86-29876