Case Information: 86-CF-0101 | |||
Short Caption: | JOHN M. TEMPLE V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F430-85 | Filed Date: | 01/07/1986 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 01/07/1986 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 09/25/1986 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 11/25/1987 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 04/05/1988 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 04/29/1988 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John M. Temple | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | TEMPLE, JOHN M. UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 CODEF: MICHAEL D. STROUD, JR. NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 062486 ORD: GRANT MO FOR FORMA NOTE - 02 PAUPERIS & CLERK OF SUPER CRT NOTE - 03 TO FL RECORD; APPT SANDRA J. NOTE - 03 BOEK TO REPRESENT APLT; COUNSL NOTE - 04 FOR APLT TO FL STATEMENT IN 20 NOTE - 04 DAYS RE STATUS OF RT. NOTE - 05 090287 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 05 FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO THE NOTE - 06 EXTENT THAT BR DUE 9/4/87- NOTE - 06 ABSOLUTELY-NFX; FAILURE TO NOTE - 07 FILE THE BR IN THE EXTENDED NOTE - 07 PERIOD & COUNSEL'S APPOINTMENT NOTE - 08 WILL BE VACATED & THIS MATTER NOTE - 08 REFERRED TO THE BPR. NOTE - 09 11/25/87 ORD: GRT APLE'S MO NOTE - 09 TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF; CLK NOTE - 10 DIRTD TO FILE LODGED BRIEF. FO NOTE - 10 THAT CLK IS DIRTD TO CALENDAR NOTE - 11 THIS CASE FOR CONSIDERATION NOTE - 11 BEFORE A MERITS DIVISION AS NOTE - 12 SOON AS THE BUSINESS OF THE NOTE - 12 COURT PERMITS. | |||
01/07/1986 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
03/10/1986 | LETTER REQUESTING APLT TO FILE FORM 5 AFF & REQUEST TO APPT. COUNSEL RE-SENT LTR 3/21 TO NEW ADDRES PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/07/1986 | APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE AFFIDAVIT TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS GG PANEL SCDATE 042186 SCHPRD ANS | |||
06/24/1986 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) SANDRA J. BOEK, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/24/1986 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04 ACG PANELPY SCDATE 031086 SCHPRD R | |||
07/10/1986 | STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: STATUS OF TRANSCRIPT GG PANEL SCDATE 070786 SCHPRD STATE | |||
09/25/1986 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
09/25/1986 | RECORD ON APPEAL (406 PGS - RAMOS) PB PANEL SCDATE 072186 SCHPRD R | |||
11/12/1986 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 12TH (NO OPPO) JB TTC PANEL SCDATE 111086 SCHPRD BA | |||
12/15/1986 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/12/87 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 121286 SCHPRD BA | |||
12/19/1986 | ORDER GRANT MO ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT APLT'S BRIEF DUE IN 30 DAYS; NFX TTC PANELPY SCDATE 122986 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
01/20/1987 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 20TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 011987 SCHPRD BA | |||
02/04/1987 | ORDER GRANT MO; APLT'S BRIEF DUE 2/20/87; ABSOLUTELY NFX TTC PANELBE SCDATE 013087 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
02/20/1987 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 23RD JB PANEL SCDATE 022087 SCHPRD BA | |||
03/03/1987 | ORDER GRANT APLT MO ONLY TO EXTENT THAT BR IS DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 030487 SCHPRD OPE | |||
05/01/1987 | ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: NO APLT BR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 031387 SCHPRD BA | |||
05/11/1987 | APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO MAY 1ST COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 051187 SCHPRD STATE | |||
05/21/1987 | ORDER APLT'S BR DUE IN 30 DAYS. TTC PANELPY SCDATE 052287 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
07/17/1987 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LV TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE TO JUNE 30TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/17/1987 | RECEIVED APLT'S RESPONSE TO 6/30/87 ORD & REQUEST TO EXTEND TO 8/21/87 TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/21/1987 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 062587 SCHPRD BA | |||
09/02/1987 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05 - 08. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 072987 SCHPRD OPE | |||
09/04/1987 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 090487 SCHPRD BA | |||
10/02/1987 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 5, 1987 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD BE EXTDTE 110587 | |||
11/05/1987 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 10TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 110587 SCHPRD BE | |||
11/10/1987 | RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG (MXBE STILL PENDING) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/25/1987 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
11/25/1987 | APPELEE'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/25/1987 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 9 THRU 12 SL PANELPY SCDATE 111687 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
04/05/1988 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
04/05/1988 | SUBMITTED PANELPYTEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/06/1988 | AFFIRMED MOJ AF TRIAL COURT JUDGMENT PANELPYTEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/06/1988 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
04/29/1988 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |