Case Description
Case ID: | 16-A-505 - SIDNEI SILVA VS KATIE ELIZABETH SUNDSETH | |
Filing Date: | Wednesday, March 09th, 2016 | |
Type: | TG - TORT-OTHER | |
Status: | SFINAL - FINAL DISPOSITION OF CASE |
Related Cases
No related cases were found.
Case Event Schedule
No case events were found.
Case Parties
Seq # | Assoc | Expn Date | Type | Birth Year | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 30-DEC-2016 | JUDGE | CLAYTON, MELODIE H | ||
Address: | 12 EAST PARK SQUARE MARIETTA GA 30090 | Aliases: | none | ||
2 | 6 | PLAINTIFF 1 | SILVA, SIDNEI | ||
Address: | 3041 PATTEN DRIVE MARIETTA GA 30062 | Aliases: | none | ||
3 | DEFENDANT 1 | SUNDSETH, KATIE ELIZABETH | |||
Address: | 1095 BELLAIRE COURT LAWRENCEVILLE GA 30043 | Aliases: | none | ||
4 | 02-MAY-2018 | ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF | JONES, GARY WILSON | ||
Address: | 145 CHURCH ST PO BOX 4926 MARIETTA GA 30061 (770)423-1930 | Aliases: | none | ||
5 | JUDGE | SALTER, ALLISON B. | |||
Address: | 12 EAST PARK SQUARE MARIETTA GA 30090 | Aliases: | none | ||
6 | 2 | ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF | BLEVINS JR, RICHARD N | ||
Address: | 191 ROSWELL STREET MARIETTA GA 30060 | Aliases: | none | ||
Docket Entries
Filing Date | Description | Name | Monetary |
---|---|---|---|
09-MAR-2016 09:54 AM | COMPLAINT | ||
Entry: | none. | ||
09-MAR-2016 09:54 AM | SUMMONS ISSUED | ||
Entry: | none. | ||
09-MAR-2016 09:54 AM | RUSH FEE PAID | ||
Entry: | none. | ||
09-MAR-2016 09:54 AM | SERVICE SENT OUT | ||
Entry: | none. | ||
10-MAR-2016 08:19 AM | ACTIVITY SHEET PRINTED BY SHRF | ||
Entry: | Docket entry for the letter produced from CCADREQ on 10-MAR-2016. | ||
17-MAR-2016 12:00 AM | SERVICE NON EST (INCOMPLETE) | SUNDSETH, KATIE ELIZABETH | |
Entry: | PER TENANT ADVISED SUBECT MOVED OUT 2 MONTHS AGO. | ||
21-MAR-2016 12:21 PM | SHERIFF ENTRY OF SERVICE FILED | ||
Entry: | none. | ||
11-JAN-2018 03:50 PM | ORDER-PLACING CASE ON CALENDAR | ||
Entry: | THIS CASE IS PLACED ON THE SPECIALLY SET STATUS/PEREMPTORY CALENDAR TUESDAY MAY 8 AT 1:30 PM | ||
12-JAN-2018 08:23 AM | PEREMPTORY CAL NOTC PROD/SENT | ||
Entry: | Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 12-JAN-2018. | ||
24-MAR-2018 10:59 AM | AFF PROCESS SER/PERSONAL | ||
Entry: | KATIE GINELLA SUNDSETH | ||
28-MAR-2018 10:59 AM | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED | ||
Entry: | none. | ||
28-MAR-2018 02:27 PM | REMOVED FROM CALENDAR | ||
Entry: | none. | ||
29-MAR-2018 12:42 PM | NOTIFICATION CERTIFICATE | JONES, GARY WILSON | |
Entry: | OF WITHDRAWAL | ||
29-MAR-2018 12:50 PM | NOTICE INTENT/WITHDRAW COUNSEL | JONES, GARY WILSON | |
Entry: | none. | ||
02-MAY-2018 02:18 PM | ORDER-GRANT WITHDRAWAL ATT | ||
Entry: | GARN WILSON JONES | ||
18-MAY-2018 11:05 AM | MOTION-DEFAULT JUDGMENT | SILVA, SIDNEI | |
Entry: | none. | ||
18-MAY-2018 11:05 AM | AFFIDAVIT OF COUNSEL | BLEVINS JR, RICHARD N | |
Entry: | none. | ||
18-MAY-2018 11:10 AM | CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT | SILVA, SIDNEI | |
Entry: | none. | ||
23-MAY-2018 11:05 AM | ORDER | ||
Entry: | PLAINTIFF MAY SET HIS CASE DOWN FOR A HEARING AGAINST SAID DEF AS TO THE ISSUE OF DAMAGES ONLY | ||
30-MAY-2018 09:57 AM | STIPULATION TO CALENDAR | SILVA, SIDNEI | |
Entry: | NON-JURY DEFAULT CALENDAR | ||
30-MAY-2018 03:29 PM | NJ NOTICE PRODUCED/SENT | ||
Entry: | Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 30-MAY-2018. | ||
17-JUL-2018 09:26 AM | NOTICE-LEAVE OF ABSENCE | BLEVINS JR, RICHARD N | |
Entry: | none. | ||
08-AUG-2018 01:12 PM | NOTICE-LEAVE OF ABSENCE | BLEVINS JR, RICHARD N | |
Entry: | AMENDED | ||
14-AUG-2018 02:46 PM | CONTINUED BY JUDGE/NO ORDER | ||
Entry: | none. | ||
21-AUG-2018 02:47 PM | NJ NOTICE PRODUCED/SENT | ||
Entry: | Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 21-AUG-2018. | ||
02-OCT-2018 09:57 AM | CORRESPONDENCE-FIFA REQUEST | ||
Entry: | none. | ||
02-OCT-2018 09:57 AM | FIFA ISSUED | ||
Entry: | EXECUTION AGAINST: KATIE ELIZABETH SUNDSETH DATE OF JUDGMENT: 02-OCT-2018 DATE OF EXECUTION: 02-OCT-2018 DATE EXECUTION ENTERED: 02-OCT-2018 PRINCIPAL: $112625.00 INTEREST: $0.00 ATTYS FEES: $0.00 COST: $320.00 TOTAL: $ 112945.00 FIFA OUT: 02-OCT-2018 ORIGINAL FIFA SENT TO: GIVEN DIRECTLY TO PLAINTIFF | ||
02-OCT-2018 10:10 AM | FIFA CREATED | ||
Entry: | Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 02-OCT-2018. | ||
02-OCT-2018 10:11 AM | JUDGMENT-AGAINST DEFENDANT | ||
Entry: | none. | ||
02-OCT-2018 10:18 AM | CIVIL FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | ||
Entry: | Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 02-OCT-2018. | ||
02-OCT-2018 10:18 AM | FINAL DISPOS BENCH TRIAL | ||
Entry: | none. | ||
02-OCT-2018 02:45 PM | REMOV FROM CAL PER JUDGE/ANNOU | ||
Entry: | none. | ||
Offenses
No offenses were found.