Case: PD-0060-97
PD-0060-97
01/10/1997
PDR Case Type
KOSLOW, KRISTI ANNE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/27/1997 | RESPONSE FILED | State | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/29/1997 | MOTION DISP | DENIED | |
04/29/1997 | REHEAR REJECTED | | |
04/28/1997 | MOTION FILED | | |
04/28/1997 | REHEAR RECEIVED | | |
04/25/1997 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
04/09/1997 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
04/09/1997 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
01/27/1997 | RESPONSE FILED | | |
01/10/1997 | PDR FILED | | |
01/10/1997 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/01/1997 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Tim Curry |
KOSLOW, KRISTI ANNE | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Allan K. Butcher |
Court of Appeals Information:
02-94-00385-CR
AFF 7-11-96
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
0522275AR