Case Heading (S-11-0266) | |||||
Case Number: | S-11-0266 | Case Docketed On: | 11/18/2011 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Eighth Judicial District Goshen County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1) | ||
Short Title: | GEORGE M. and GERALDINE E. ZEIMENS v. CITY OF TORRINGTON, a Municipal Corporation; and the BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF GOSHEN | ||||
Full Title: | GEORGE M. and GERALDINE E. ZEIMENS, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. CITY OF TORRINGTON, a Municipal Corporation; and the BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF GOSHEN, Appellees (Defendants). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | George M. Zeimens | Brandon Lee Jensen Karen Budd Falen |
Appellant | Geraldine E. Zeimens | Brandon Lee Jensen Karen Budd Falen |
Appellee | City of Torrington | Loyd Edgar Smith Andrew Frederick Sears |
Appellee | The Board of County Commissioners of Goshen County, Wyoming | Loyd Edgar Smith Andrew Frederick Sears |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Roads |
Opinion Number: | 2012 WY 97 |
Citation: | 280 P.3d 1181 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
11/18/2011 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
11/18/2011 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
11/18/2011 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
11/18/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
12/28/2011 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
12/29/2011 | Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellants. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/29/2011 | Notice-Incoming - copy of designation of record by appellants. | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
02/09/2012 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
02/09/2012 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
02/21/2012 | Brief - Appellees | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
02/22/2012 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellees | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
03/05/2012 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
03/07/2012 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
03/08/2012 | Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of Appellants George and Geraldine Zeimens | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
03/08/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
03/12/2012 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Loyd E. Smith obo Appellees | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
03/12/2012 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Brandon L. Jensen obo Appellants | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
03/15/2012 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
03/15/2012 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript; Volume III, Exhibit Notebook. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
03/15/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
04/18/2012 | Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Brandon Jensen for Appellants; Loyd Smith for Appellees) and taken under advisement. | Event | Oral argument presented | Final | |
04/18/2012 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
07/18/2012 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
08/03/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
08/03/2012 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
08/03/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
08/03/2012 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
08/07/2012 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/6/2012. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |