Case Information: 15-CV-0544 | |||
Short Caption: | ERIC HERRION V. DELWIN REALTY, LLC | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | LTB23868-14 | Filed Date: | 04/27/2015 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/27/2015 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 09/08/2015 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Eric Herrion | Y | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | Delwin Realty LLC | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
04/27/2015 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
06/10/2015 | Filed | Record Copies | ||
06/10/2015 | Filed | Record Index | ||
06/29/2015 | Filed | Order To Show Cause (NON FINAL & NON APPEALABLE) | ||
06/29/2015 | Filed | TMC//OTSC//MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND | ||
07/20/2015 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File a response to the Show Cause Order (Appellant) | Denied | |
08/04/2015 | Filed | ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME and F/O DISMISSING the APPEAL | ||
08/04/2015 | Filed | Dismissed | ||
09/08/2015 | Filed | Mandate |