Case Information: 11-DA-0014 | |||
Short Caption: | BONNIE ADIGUNOLUJIDE V. BRANCH BANK & TRUST BANKCARD CORP. | Classification: | Discretionary - Discretionary - Small Claims |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | SC3-11071-07 | Filed Date: | 05/02/2011 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 05/02/2011 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer |
Petitioner | Bonnie Adigunolujide | N | Pro Se | N | |
Respondent | Branch Bank & Trust Bankcard Corporation | N | Pro Se | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
05/02/2011 | APPLICATION FOR ALLOWANCE OF APPEAL | |||
05/02/2011 | FILING FEE of $10.00. | |||
06/15/2011 | ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this AAA should not be dismissed either for having been taken from a non-final order, or how petitioner is AGGRIEVED by the 4/27/11 order... (BY: ETW) | |||
07/05/2011 | RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |||
07/06/2011 | Filed | PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to amend response to show cause. | ||
07/06/2011 | RECEIVED - amended show cause. | |||
07/12/2011 | Filed | TMC - OTSC; ROTSC | ||
08/01/2011 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Leave and CLERK SHALL FILE AMENDED RESPONSE | ||
08/01/2011 | Filed | AMENDED Response To Order To Show Cause (Petitioner) | ||
08/01/2011 | Filed | Order Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal | ||
08/01/2011 | Filed | Dismissed |