Register of Actions
Case No. DF-86-02458
AZMAT NAJAM vs. BATEMAN MARCIA | § § § § § |
|
Lead Attorneys | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
PETITIONER | AZMAT, NAJAM | BRUCE N PATTON Retained 469-288-1082(W) | ||
RESPONDENT | BATEMAN, MARCIA | |||
DISPOSITIONS | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/19/1986 | JUDGMENT NON-JURY
| |||||||
OTHER EVENTS AND HEARINGS | ||||||||
02/20/1986 | ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) Case Petitioned | |||||||
02/20/1986 | - BRUCE N PATTON Vol./Book 0000000 | |||||||
02/20/1986 | - CLERKS FEE Vol./Book 0000000 | |||||||
02/20/1986 | - STENO FEE Vol./Book 0000000 | |||||||
02/20/1986 | - SHERIFFS FEE Vol./Book 0000000 | |||||||
02/20/1986 | - LAW LIBRARY FUND Vol./Book 0000000 | |||||||
02/20/1986 | - STATE CLERKS FEE Vol./Book 0000000 | |||||||
02/20/1986 | - MEDIATION FUND Vol./Book 0000000 | |||||||
02/24/1986 | - CIT & COP CERT/MAIL Vol./Book 0000000 | |||||||
03/03/1986 | - RET CIT CERT MAIL Vol./Book 0047350 | |||||||
05/08/1986 | - WAIVER Vol./Book 0000000 | |||||||
06/19/1986 | - REPORT TO BVS Vol./Book 0000000 | |||||||
06/19/1986 | - C/C JUDG TO RESP Vol./Book 0000000 | |||||||
06/19/1986 | - E/JUDGMENT 00000000 Vol./Book 242/445 |
MAINFRAME CONV PARTY Legacy Financial Management | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Total Financial Assessment | 157.00 | |||||
Total Payments and Credits | 157.00 | |||||
Balance Due as of 06/06/2014 | 0.00 | |||||
02/20/1986 | Transaction Assessment | 38.00 | ||||
02/20/1986 | Transaction Assessment | 3.00 | ||||
02/20/1986 | Transaction Assessment | 23.00 | ||||
02/20/1986 | Transaction Assessment | 10.00 | ||||
02/20/1986 | Transaction Assessment | 40.00 | ||||
02/20/1986 | Transaction Assessment | 5.00 | ||||
02/20/1986 | PAYMENT (CASE FEES) | Receipt # 0017406-4860245800-00000 | AZMAT, NAJAM | (157.00) | ||
02/24/1986 | Transaction Assessment | 8.00 | ||||
03/03/1986 | Transaction Assessment | 30.00 | ||||
Case Number | Style | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
---|---|---|---|
DF-86-02458 | AZMAT NAJAM vs. BATEMAN MARCIA | 02/20/1986 254th District Court | DIVORCE CLOSED |