Case Information: 17-FM-0955 | |||
Short Caption: | JORGE ALEXIS CAMACHO V. BREESE JANICE EDDY | Classification: | Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CPO4821-16 | Filed Date: | 08/22/2017 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/22/2017 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 01/05/2018 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 04/19/2018 |
Party Information | |||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer |
Appellant | Jorge Alexis Camacho | N | Pro Se | N | |
Appellee | Breese Janice Eddy | N | Pro Se | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
08/22/2017 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
09/18/2017 | Filed | Order To Show Cause | ||
09/18/2017 | Filed | TMC | ||
10/16/2017 | Filed | Record Index and copies. | ||
10/17/2017 | Filed | Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee) | Denied as Moot | |
10/23/2017 | Filed | ORDER DISCHARGING the order to show cause and F/O DENYING appellee's motion to dismiss as moot | ||
10/27/2017 | Filed | Initial Order - directing statement regarding transcript | ||
11/01/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record #1 (18pages/Tape) 11/21/16 proceeding | ||
11/09/2017 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) | ||
01/05/2018 | Filed | Supplemental Record #2 (16pages/Tape) 6/15/17 proceeding | ||
01/05/2018 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
01/11/2018 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
02/23/2018 | Filed | Order -directing motion, brief & appendix (Appellant) | ||
03/28/2018 | Filed | Order Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal | ||
03/28/2018 | Filed | Dismissed | ||
04/19/2018 | Filed | Mandate |