Register of Actions
Case No. J5-CR-21-001228
State of Texas vs. JOSEPH JAMES ROGAN | § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | ROGAN, JOSEPH JAMES | White | ||
AUSTIN, TX 78733 | ||||
State | State of Texas | |||
Charges: ROGAN, JOSEPH JAMES | Statute | Level | Date | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
2. | FAILURE TO MAINTAIN LIABILITY INSURANCE | TRC 601.071 | Class C Misdemeanor | 05/17/2021 | |
DISPOSITIONS | |||
---|---|---|---|
06/09/2021 | Plea (Judicial Officer: Chu, Nicholas) 2. FAILURE TO MAINTAIN LIABILITY INSURANCE Nolo Contendere | ||
06/09/2021 | Disposition (Judicial Officer: Chu, Nicholas) 2. FAILURE TO MAINTAIN LIABILITY INSURANCE Convicted | ||
OTHER EVENTS AND HEARINGS | |||
06/04/2021 | Case Filed - Criminal (OCA) | ||
06/04/2021 | Courtesy Letter Pending | ||
06/08/2021 | Comment |
Defendant ROGAN, JOSEPH JAMES | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Total Financial Assessment | 266.00 | |||||
Total Payments and Credits | 266.00 | |||||
Balance Due as of 07/16/2022 | 0.00 | |||||
06/04/2021 | Transaction Assessment | 266.00 | ||||
06/08/2021 | E-Payment | Receipt # 2021-72140 | Joe Rogan | (266.00) | ||
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
J5-CR-21-001228 | ROGAN, JOSEPH JAMES | 06/04/2021 Precinct Five | Criminal Final Disposition |
|