Register of Actions
Case No. 13-293355
State of Texas VS OBERMAN, AARON BRICE | § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Oberman, Aaron Brice | Male White DOB: 11/26/1980 | John Paul Hopkins Retained 936-441-0663(W) | |
9617 FM 149 MONTGOMERY, TX 77304 SID: TX06203080 Other Agency Numbers 984279 Unknown | ||||
State | The State of Texas | |||
District Attorney's Office 207 W. Phillips, 2nd Floor Conroe, TX 77301 |
Charges: Oberman, Aaron Brice | Statute | Level | Date | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | DRIVING WHILE INTOXICATED | 49.04 PC | Class B Misdemeanor | 12/10/2013 | |
DISPOSITIONS | |||
---|---|---|---|
12/16/2014 | Disposition (Judicial Officer: Turner, Mary Ann) 1. DRIVING WHILE INTOXICATED Dismissed | ||
12/16/2014 | Plea (Judicial Officer: Turner, Mary Ann) 1. DRIVING WHILE INTOXICATED Not Guilty | ||
12/16/2014 | Sentenced - Other (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Turner, Mary Ann) 1. DRIVING WHILE INTOXICATED | ||
OTHER EVENTS AND HEARINGS | |||
12/10/2013 | Blood Search Warrant | ||
12/11/2013 | Bond | ||
12/12/2013 | Complaint (OCA) | ||
12/12/2013 | Information | ||
12/12/2013 | CCL4 | ||
12/13/2013 | Reset | ||
12/13/2013 | Jail Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Turner, Mary Ann) | ||
12/18/2013 | Reset | ||
12/20/2013 | Jail Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Turner, Mary Ann) | ||
12/27/2013 | Jail Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Turner, Mary Ann) | ||
01/15/2014 | Reset | ||
01/15/2014 | Arraignment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Turner, Mary Ann) | ||
03/17/2014 | Reset | ||
03/17/2014 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Turner, Mary Ann) | ||
04/28/2014 | Reset | ||
04/28/2014 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Turner, Mary Ann) | ||
05/20/2014 | Reset | ||
05/20/2014 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Turner, Mary Ann) | ||
06/10/2014 | Reset | ||
06/10/2014 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Turner, Mary Ann) | ||
07/18/2014 | Notice of Representation | ||
07/22/2014 | Reset | ||
07/22/2014 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Turner, Mary Ann) | ||
08/28/2014 | Reset | ||
08/28/2014 | Plea (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Turner, Mary Ann) | ||
09/16/2014 | Reset | ||
09/18/2014 | Plea (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Turner, Mary Ann) | ||
10/30/2014 | Reset | ||
11/03/2014 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Turner, Mary Ann) | ||
12/16/2014 | Judgment - Dismissed | ||
12/16/2014 | Motion for Leave to Destroy Evidence | ||
12/16/2014 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Turner, Mary Ann) |
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
13-293355 | Oberman, Aaron Brice 11/26/1980 | 12/12/2013 County Court at Law #4 | Criminal Misdemeanor Closed |
|