Register of Actions
Case No. 14-301981
State of Texas VS OBERMAN, AARON BRICE | § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Oberman, Aaron Brice | Male White DOB: 11/26/1980 | E Tay Bond Retained 936-539-1007(W) | |
9617 FM 149 MONTGOMERY, TX 77304 SID: TX06203080 Other Agency Numbers 984279 Unknown | ||||
State | The State of Texas | |||
District Attorney's Office 207 W. Phillips, 2nd Floor Conroe, TX 77301 |
Charges: Oberman, Aaron Brice | Statute | Level | Date | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | DRIVING WHILE LICENSE INVALID | 601.371 | Class C Misdemeanor | 09/03/2013 | |
DISPOSITIONS | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/16/2014 | Disposition (Judicial Officer: Turner, Mary Ann) 1. DRIVING WHILE LICENSE INVALID Deferred | |||||||
12/16/2014 | Plea (Judicial Officer: Turner, Mary Ann) 1. DRIVING WHILE LICENSE INVALID Guilty | |||||||
12/16/2014 | Sentenced - Probation/Supervision (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Turner, Mary Ann) 1. DRIVING WHILE LICENSE INVALID
| |||||||
04/09/2015 | Amended Disposition (Judicial Officer: Turner, Mary Ann) Reason: Other 1. DRIVING WHILE LICENSE INVALID Dismissed | |||||||
OTHER EVENTS AND HEARINGS | ||||||||
10/21/2014 | Bond | |||||||
10/21/2014 | Case Appealed from Lower Court (OCA) | |||||||
11/18/2014 | Reset | |||||||
11/18/2014 | CCL4 | |||||||
12/16/2014 | Judgment | |||||||
12/16/2014 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Turner, Mary Ann) | |||||||
04/09/2015 | Judgment - Dismissal after Deferred |
Defendant Oberman, Aaron Brice | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Total Financial Assessment | 278.10 | |||||
Total Payments and Credits | 278.10 | |||||
Balance Due as of 04/21/2020 | 0.00 | |||||
11/18/2014 | Transaction Assessment | 278.10 | ||||
12/16/2014 | Payment | Receipt # 380068 | OBERMAN,AARON BRICE | (278.10) | ||
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
14-301981 | Oberman, Aaron Brice 11/26/1980 | 11/18/2014 County Court at Law #4 | Criminal Misdemeanor Closed |
|