Register of Actions
Case No. 14-301982
State of Texas VS OBERMAN, AARON BRICE | § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Oberman, Aaron Brice | Male White DOB: 11/26/1980 | E Tay Bond Retained 936-539-1007(W) | |
9617 FM 149 MONTGOMERY, TX 77304 SID: TX06203080 Other Agency Numbers 984279 Unknown | ||||
State | The State of Texas | |||
District Attorney's Office 207 W. Phillips, 2nd Floor Conroe, TX 77301 |
Charges: Oberman, Aaron Brice | Statute | Level | Date | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | VIOLATE PROMISE TO APPEAR | 543.009 | Class C Misdemeanor | 09/03/2013 | |
DISPOSITIONS | |||
---|---|---|---|
12/16/2014 | Disposition (Judicial Officer: Turner, Mary Ann) 1. VIOLATE PROMISE TO APPEAR Dismissed | ||
12/16/2014 | Plea (Judicial Officer: Turner, Mary Ann) 1. VIOLATE PROMISE TO APPEAR Not Guilty | ||
12/16/2014 | Sentenced - Other (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Turner, Mary Ann) 1. VIOLATE PROMISE TO APPEAR | ||
OTHER EVENTS AND HEARINGS | |||
10/21/2014 | Bond | ||
10/21/2014 | Case Appealed from Lower Court (OCA) | ||
11/18/2014 | Reset | ||
11/18/2014 | CCL4 | ||
12/16/2014 | Judgment - Dismissed | ||
12/16/2014 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Turner, Mary Ann) |
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
14-301982 | Oberman, Aaron Brice 11/26/1980 | 11/18/2014 County Court at Law #4 | Criminal Misdemeanor Closed |
|