Case: 05-17-00525-CR
05-17-00525-CR
05/17/2017
Murder
Angel Tovar
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/26/2018 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
02/05/2018 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State |
| ||||
12/04/2017 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/12/2018 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
11/06/2018 | Case returned from higher court | | |||||
10/10/2018 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | | ||||
09/06/2018 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||||
08/30/2018 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |||||
07/09/2018 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
06/29/2018 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
06/29/2018 | Retention time case file will be retained | Retain | | ||||
05/15/2018 | Submitted | | |||||
02/28/2018 | Set for submission on oral argument |
| |||||
02/26/2018 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||
02/05/2018 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
02/05/2018 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
02/05/2018 | Corrected document requested |
| |||||
02/02/2018 | State brief due | | |||||
01/03/2018 | State brief due | | |||||
12/19/2017 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
12/18/2017 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
12/04/2017 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
12/04/2017 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
11/04/2017 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
10/30/2017 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
10/27/2017 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
10/04/2017 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
09/07/2017 | No reporters record filed in criminal case |
| |||||
09/07/2017 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
09/05/2017 | Record due | | |||||
05/25/2017 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
05/17/2017 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
05/17/2017 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
05/08/2017 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
05/08/2017 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
05/08/2017 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/29/2018 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Adam L. Seidel |
Tovar, Angel | Criminal - Appellant | Michael Mowla |
Trial Court Information
292nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Brandon Birmingham
F-1700026-V
Peri Wood
Life institutional division, TDCJ