Case: 12-92-00173-CV
12-92-00173-CV
05/18/1992
Miscellaneous civil
Leos, Sammy Urbano, Jr.
Texas Department of Criminal Justice, et al
No
11th Court of Appeals
06/05/1992
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/05/1992 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ No Action Taken | |
06/05/1992 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/05/1992 | Submission | | |
06/05/1992 | Submitted | | |
05/29/1992 | Brief Filed | | |
05/18/1992 | No Description Available. | | |
05/18/1992 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
05/14/1992 | Affidavit Filed. | | |
05/14/1992 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/30/1992 | Order Entered | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/06/2012 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Brookshire, III, C.o. Douglas | Appellee | Douglas Brookshire, C. O. Iii |
Davis, P. | Appellee | Pamela Davis |
Leos, Jr., Sammy Urbano | Appellant | Sammy Urbano Leos, Jr. |
Hailey, III, C.o. Mr. | Appellee | Mr. Hailey, C. O. Iii |
Johnson, Sandy | Appellee | Sandy Johnson |
Bell, Gregory W. C.o.iii | Appellee | Gregory W. Bell, C. O. Iii |
Texas Department Of Criminal J | Appellee | Mr. James A. Lynaugh |
Trial Court Information
369th District Court
Anderson
Honorable Cynthia S. Kent
369-92-705