Case: 13-0505
13-0505
07/02/2013
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
JOHN FLOWERS
CITY OF DIBOLL, TEXAS, STEVE BAKER AND KENT HAVARD
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/02/2013 | Motion for Rehearing | Rehearing filed in Petition for Review | Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of John Flowers. |
| ||||
07/29/2013 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of John Flowers. (HARD COPIES REC'D) |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/16/2014 | Case Stored - stored case location updated | Row 6 D-4 | | |||||
11/18/2013 | Case Stored | Row 22 I-3 | | |||||
11/12/2013 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
11/08/2013 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
10/08/2013 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
10/02/2013 | Motion for Rehearing | Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of John Flowers. |
| |||||
09/20/2013 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Rehearing due 10/02/13. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. |
| ||||
09/20/2013 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of John Flowers. |
| |||||
09/06/2013 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
08/06/2013 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
07/31/2013 | Response Waiver filed | Waiver of Response filed on behalf of City of Diboll, Texas, et al. | ||||||
07/29/2013 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of John Flowers. (HARD COPIES REC'D) |
| |||||
07/03/2013 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Petition is due July 29, 2013. |
| ||||
07/02/2013 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review. On behalf of John Flowers. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/16/2014 | Case Stored | Case stored. | |
11/18/2013 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Row 22 I-3 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
City of Diboll, Texas | Respondent | Mr. Robert T. Cain Jr. Ms. Erika L. Neill Mr. Galen Robert Alderman Jr. |
Flores, John | Petitioner | Mr. Michael R. McGown Mr. Ryan Withington Gertz |
Court of Appeals Information:
12-12-00107-CV
Affirmed
___ SW3d ___, 05-22-13
12th Court of Appeals
Honorable Sam Griffith
Trial Court Information
159th District Court
Angelina
Honorable Paul E. White
41,039-07-12