Register of Actions
Case No. 08-238813
State of Texas VS OBERMAN, AARON BRICE | § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Oberman, Aaron Brice | Male White DOB: 11/26/1980 | ||
9617 FM 149 MONTGOMERY, TX 77304 SID: TX06203080 Other Agency Numbers 984279 Unknown | ||||
State | The State of Texas | |||
District Attorney's Office 207 W. Phillips, 2nd Floor Conroe, TX 77301 |
Charges: Oberman, Aaron Brice | Statute | Level | Date | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | CRIM MISCH>$500<$1500 | 28.03(b)(3) PC | Class A Misdemeanor | 01/14/2008 | |
DISPOSITIONS | |||
---|---|---|---|
08/08/2008 | Disposition (Judicial Officer: Watson, Dennis) 1. CRIM MISCH>$500<$1500 Dismissed | ||
08/08/2008 | Plea (Judicial Officer: Watson, Dennis) 1. CRIM MISCH>$500<$1500 Not Guilty | ||
08/08/2008 | Sentenced - Other (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Watson, Dennis) 1. CRIM MISCH>$500<$1500 | ||
OTHER EVENTS AND HEARINGS | |||
03/31/2008 | Complaint (OCA) | ||
03/31/2008 | Information | ||
03/31/2008 | Affidavit For Order of Arrest | ||
03/31/2008 | Original Warrant | ||
03/31/2008 | CCL1 | ||
08/06/2008 | Warrant Recall | ||
08/08/2008 | Judgment - Dismissed |
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08-238813 | Oberman, Aaron Brice 11/26/1980 | 03/31/2008 County Court at Law #1 | Criminal Misdemeanor Disposed |
|