Register of Actions
Case No. 08-245254
State of Texas VS OBERMAN, AARON BRICE | § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Oberman, Aaron Brice | Male White DOB: 11/26/1980 | John Paul Hopkins Retained 936-441-0663(W) | |
9617 FM 149 MONTGOMERY, TX 77304 SID: TX06203080 Other Agency Numbers 984279 Unknown | ||||
State | The State of Texas | |||
District Attorney's Office 207 W. Phillips, 2nd Floor Conroe, TX 77301 |
Charges: Oberman, Aaron Brice | Statute | Level | Date | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | ASSAULT CAUSES B.I.:FAMILY VIOLENCE | 22.01(a)(1) PC | Class A Misdemeanor | 07/08/2008 | |
DISPOSITIONS | |||
---|---|---|---|
11/03/2009 | Disposition (Judicial Officer: Watson, Dennis) 1. ASSAULT CAUSES B.I.:FAMILY VIOLENCE Convicted Straight - Jail | ||
11/03/2009 | Plea (Judicial Officer: Watson, Dennis) 1. ASSAULT CAUSES B.I.:FAMILY VIOLENCE Guilty | ||
11/03/2009 | Sentenced - Local Jail (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Watson, Dennis) 1. ASSAULT CAUSES B.I.:FAMILY VIOLENCE | ||
OTHER EVENTS AND HEARINGS | |||
12/19/2008 | Complaint (OCA) | ||
12/19/2008 | Information | ||
12/19/2008 | Affidavit For Order of Arrest | ||
12/19/2008 | Original Warrant | ||
12/19/2008 | CCL1 | ||
02/11/2009 | Bond | ||
02/20/2009 | Jail Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Watson, Dennis) | ||
03/04/2009 | Reset | ||
03/04/2009 | Arraignment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Watson, Dennis) | ||
05/04/2009 | Reset | ||
05/05/2009 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Watson, Dennis) | ||
06/02/2009 | Reset | ||
06/02/2009 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Watson, Dennis) | ||
07/07/2009 | Reset | ||
07/07/2009 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Watson, Dennis) | ||
08/04/2009 | Reset | ||
08/04/2009 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Watson, Dennis) | ||
09/08/2009 | Reset | ||
09/08/2009 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Watson, Dennis) | ||
10/06/2009 | Reset | ||
10/06/2009 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Watson, Dennis) | ||
11/03/2009 | Judgment | ||
11/03/2009 | Collection Agreement | ||
11/03/2009 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Watson, Dennis) | ||
11/03/2009 | Collections - Collections |
Defendant Oberman, Aaron Brice | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Total Financial Assessment | 2,278.00 | |||||
Total Payments and Credits | 2,278.00 | |||||
Balance Due as of 04/21/2020 | 0.00 | |||||
07/24/2008 | Transaction Assessment | 2,278.00 | ||||
11/03/2009 | Payment | Receipt # 211246 | OBERMAN,AARON BRICE | (2,278.00) | ||
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08-245254 | Oberman, Aaron Brice 11/26/1980 | 12/19/2008 County Court at Law #1 | Criminal Misdemeanor Closed |
|