Case: 12-0624
12-0624
08/01/2012
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
RAHUL K. NATH, M.D.
TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL AND BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/10/2012 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Rahul K. Nath, M.D. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/23/2015 | Case Stored | Consolidated into 12-0620 on 10/15/12 stored G02 Row 14 D-4 | | |||||
10/19/2012 | Petition for Review disposed | Record in case consolidated with another case. | consolidated with case no. 12-0620. | | ||||
10/10/2012 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Rahul K. Nath, M.D. |
| |||||
09/11/2012 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Second Motion to Extend Time to file Petition granted. Petition is due October 10, 2012. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. |
| ||||
09/05/2012 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Petitioner Dr. Rahul Nath, M.D. unopposed second motion for extension of time to file Petition. |
| |||||
08/07/2012 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time is granted. Petition for Review is due September 10, 2012. |
| ||||
08/01/2012 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Rahul K. Nath, M.D. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
01/23/2015 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02 Row 14-D-4 (consolidated into 12-0620) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Baylor College of Medicine | Respondent | Ms. Shauna Johnson Clark Mr. Edward B. Adams Junior Ms. Jaclyn Hermes Caugherty Ms. Joy M. Soloway |
Texas Children's Hospital | Respondent | Mr. Russell Gips Ms. Catherine 'Cathy' B. Smith Ms. Stacey Neumann Vu Mr. Patrick W. Mizell |
Nath, M.D., Rahul K. | Petitioner | Mr. Brad Beers Ms. Melissa A. Lorber Ms. Emily R. Jolly Mr. Craig T. Enoch |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-11-00127-CV
Affirmed
375 SW3d 403, 06-26-12
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable Adele O. Hedges
Trial Court Information
215th District Court
Harris
Honorable Steven E. Kirkland
2006-10826-A