Case: PD-1537-11
PD-1537-11
11/18/2011
PDR Case Type
FAISON, DANTE KEVIN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/05/2012 | STATUS REQUEST PDR | Explains The Discretionary Nature of The Court | |
02/17/2012 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
01/11/2012 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
11/18/2011 | PDR FILED | | |
10/06/2011 | MOT SUSPEND 9.3(B) | Granted | |
10/06/2011 | MOT SUSPEND 9.3(B) | Filed | |
10/06/2011 | EXT PDR DISP/NFE | Granted | |
10/06/2011 | EXT PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/17/2012 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
FAISON, DANTE KEVIN | Appellant | DANTE KEVIN FAISON |
Court of Appeals Information:
12-10-00359-CR
Other
DISMISSED 9-7-11
12th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
159th District Court
Angelina
Honorable GERALD A. GOODWIN
CR-29325