Case: 96-0693
96-0693
07/29/1996
App Writ of Error
VERONICA KAYAL and FAHAD KAYAL
AMERICAN PAWN AND JEWELRY INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
08/30/1996 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
07/29/1996 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
02/05/1997 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | case stored | | |
11/15/1996 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | Application for writ of error is denied, with the notation,"Writ Denied". | |
08/30/1996 | Reply to Response | | | |
08/14/1996 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Form Letter sent in response to motion for extension of time | | |
08/14/1996 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
08/12/1996 | Notice requesting filing fee | $10 Filing Fee for M/E/T to File Reply from Larry Warner, Atty for Rsp | | |
07/29/1996 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
02/05/1997 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 1B2 record returned |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
KAYAL, VERONICA | Petitioner | Mr. René B. González |
AMERICAN PAWN AND JEWELRY | Respondent | Mr. Larry Warner |
KAYAL, FAHAD | Petitioner | Mr. René B. González |
Court of Appeals Information:
13-93-00638-CV
Reversed & Dismissed
923 SW2d 670, 05-03-96
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Cameron
Honorable Everardo Garcia
CL B 31 961