Register of Actions
Case No. 02-179291
State of Texas VS OBERMAN, AARON BRICE | § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Oberman, Aaron Brice | Male White DOB: 11/26/1980 | BRENT ANDREW DORNBURG Retained 361-570-4444(W) | |
9617 FM 149 MONTGOMERY, TX 77304 SID: TX06203080 Other Agency Numbers 984279 Unknown | ||||
State | The State of Texas | |||
District Attorney's Office 207 W. Phillips, 2nd Floor Conroe, TX 77301 |
Charges: Oberman, Aaron Brice | Statute | Level | Date | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | DRIVING WHILE INTOXICATED | 49.04 PC | Class B Misdemeanor | 09/01/2002 | |
DISPOSITIONS | |||
---|---|---|---|
04/17/2003 | Disposition (Judicial Officer: Unknown, Other) 1. DRIVING WHILE INTOXICATED Dismissed | ||
04/17/2003 | Plea (Judicial Officer: Unknown, Other) 1. DRIVING WHILE INTOXICATED Not Guilty | ||
04/17/2003 | Sentenced - Other (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Unknown, Other) 1. DRIVING WHILE INTOXICATED | ||
OTHER EVENTS AND HEARINGS | |||
09/01/2002 | Bond | ||
09/12/2002 | Jail Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Unknown, Other) | ||
10/01/2002 | Complaint (OCA) | ||
10/01/2002 | Information | ||
10/01/2002 | Affidavit For Order of Arrest | ||
10/01/2002 | CCL2 | ||
10/17/2002 | Reset | ||
10/17/2002 | Arraignment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Unknown, Other) | ||
12/11/2002 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Unknown, Other) | ||
12/12/2002 | Reset | ||
02/12/2003 | Motion for Discovery | ||
02/12/2003 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Unknown, Other) | ||
02/13/2003 | Other Matters | ||
02/14/2003 | Reset | ||
03/24/2003 | Reset | ||
03/24/2003 | CC - Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Unknown, Other) | ||
04/17/2003 | Judgment - Dismissed | ||
04/21/2003 | CC - Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Unknown, Other) | ||
07/07/2003 | Motion for Leave to Destroy Evidence |
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02-179291 | Oberman, Aaron Brice 11/26/1980 | 10/01/2002 County Court at Law #2 | Criminal Misdemeanor Disposed |
|