Register of Actions
Case No. 99-145998
State of Texas VS OBERMAN, AARON BRICE | § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Oberman, Aaron Brice | Male White DOB: 11/26/1980 | John Paul Hopkins Retained 936-441-0663(W) | |
9617 FM 149 MONTGOMERY, TX 77304 SID: TX06203080 Other Agency Numbers 984279 Unknown | ||||
State | The State of Texas | |||
District Attorney's Office 207 W. Phillips, 2nd Floor Conroe, TX 77301 |
Charges: Oberman, Aaron Brice | Statute | Level | Date | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | POSS MARIJ <20Z MB | 481.121(b)(1) HSC | Class B Misdemeanor | 03/12/1999 | |
DISPOSITIONS | |||
---|---|---|---|
11/10/1999 | Disposition (Judicial Officer: Unknown, Other) 1. POSS MARIJ <20Z MB Convicted Straight - Jail | ||
11/10/1999 | Plea (Judicial Officer: Unknown, Other) 1. POSS MARIJ <20Z MB Guilty | ||
11/10/1999 | Sentenced - Local Jail (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Unknown, Other) 1. POSS MARIJ <20Z MB | ||
OTHER EVENTS AND HEARINGS | |||
03/13/1999 | Bond | ||
03/25/1999 | Jail Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Unknown, Other) | ||
03/30/1999 | Complaint (OCA) | ||
03/30/1999 | Information | ||
03/30/1999 | Affidavit For Order of Arrest | ||
03/30/1999 | CCL2 | ||
04/14/1999 | Reset | ||
04/15/1999 | Arraignment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Unknown, Other) | ||
06/16/1999 | Reset | ||
06/16/1999 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Unknown, Other) | ||
08/11/1999 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Unknown, Other) | ||
08/13/1999 | Reset | ||
09/15/1999 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Unknown, Other) | ||
09/17/1999 | Reset | ||
10/12/1999 | Reset | ||
10/12/1999 | Reset | ||
10/13/1999 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Unknown, Other) | ||
11/10/1999 | Judgment | ||
11/10/1999 | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Unknown, Other) | ||
11/21/2000 | Other Matters |
Defendant Oberman, Aaron Brice | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Total Financial Assessment | 694.25 | |||||
Total Payments and Credits | 694.25 | |||||
Balance Due as of 04/21/2020 | 0.00 | |||||
11/10/1999 | Transaction Assessment | 694.25 | ||||
11/10/1999 | Payment | Receipt # N79991 | OBERMAN,AARON BRICE | (694.25) | ||
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
99-145998 | Oberman, Aaron Brice 11/26/1980 | 03/30/1999 County Court at Law #2 | Criminal Misdemeanor Disposed |
|