Case: 02-05-00097-CR
02-05-00097-CR
03/24/2005
Murder
Tracey Ann Frame
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/17/2007 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
07/13/2007 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |||||
07/12/2007 | Order Entered | | |||||
06/06/2007 | Petition for Review Disposed in Higher Court | Refused | | ||||
04/16/2007 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |||||
03/14/2007 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA | | |||||
02/14/2007 | Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
01/11/2007 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
01/03/2007 | Other Document Filed | | |||||
12/29/2006 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |||||
12/29/2006 | Other Document Filed | | |||||
12/14/2006 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
10/23/2006 | Exhibits Filed | | |||||
10/18/2006 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
10/18/2006 | Submitted | | |||||
10/13/2006 | Motion Filed | | |||||
10/05/2006 | Letter | | |||||
07/24/2006 | Submission | | |||||
07/24/2006 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
07/24/2006 | Brief Filed | | |||||
05/25/2006 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
05/25/2006 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |||||
04/26/2006 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
04/25/2006 | Brief Filed | | |||||
04/25/2006 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |||||
04/17/2006 | Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed | | |||||
02/07/2006 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
02/06/2006 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |||||
12/09/2005 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
12/05/2005 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |||||
10/10/2005 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
10/10/2005 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |||||
09/06/2005 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||
07/05/2005 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
07/01/2005 | Request for Extension of Reporter's Record | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/01/2005 | Received Reporter's Record Affidavit or Letter | | |||||
04/11/2005 | Motion For New Trial Filed in Trial Court | | |||||
04/07/2005 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||||
03/24/2005 | Appellant's Notice of Appeal | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/17/2007 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Charles M. Mallin Michael Casillas |
Frame, Tracey Ann | Criminal - Appellant | Danny Burns |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Tarrant
Honorable Michael Thomas
0855946D
40 yrs. IDTDCJ