Case: 14-05-00150-CR
14-05-00150-CR
02/10/2005
Poss of Cocaine
Vasquez, Jesus Alejandro
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/28/2006 | Case stored | | |||
08/18/2006 | Mandate Issued | | |||
08/17/2006 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||
08/16/2006 | Record RETURNED from Higher Court | | |||
06/28/2006 | Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSED | REFUSED | | ||
04/20/2006 | Record Sent | | |||
03/27/2006 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |||
03/20/2006 | Petition for Discretionary Review FILED | | |||
03/10/2006 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |||
03/10/2006 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |||
02/23/2006 | Memorandum opinion issued | AFFIRMED |
| ||
12/22/2005 | Submitted | | |||
11/03/2005 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||
08/22/2005 | Case ready to be set | | |||
08/22/2005 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
08/22/2005 | State's brief DUE | | |||
08/02/2005 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |||
07/22/2005 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
07/21/2005 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | | ||
07/15/2005 | Response due | | |||
07/11/2005 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
07/05/2005 | Past due brief | | |||
06/27/2005 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |||
05/26/2005 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | | ||
05/17/2005 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
05/11/2005 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |||
04/11/2005 | Reporters record FILED - ANT,APP,STA | | |||
04/11/2005 | Reporter's Record Due | | |||
04/11/2005 | Record due | | |||
03/30/2005 | Clerk's record FILED - APP,STA | | |||
02/11/2005 | Clerks Certification Letter Sent | | |||
02/10/2005 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||
02/09/2005 | Date of Sentence | | |||
02/09/2005 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/28/2006 | Case Stored | RECORD RETENTION HISTORY - PERMANENT |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Vasquez, Jesus Alejandro | Criminal - Appellant | Kenneth Eugene McCoy |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Alan Curry |
Trial Court Information
183rd District Court
Harris
Honorable C. JOAN HUFFMAN
968,206
70 years TDCJ & $100,000 fine