Case: 01-96-00603-CR
01-96-00603-CR
05/06/1996
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Jacobowitz, Michael Lee
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/07/1999 | Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk | | |
02/03/1998 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
02/03/1998 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
09/25/1997 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
09/25/1997 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
09/08/1997 | Submitted | | |
09/08/1997 | Submission | | |
09/08/1997 | Submitted | | |
07/23/1997 | Submission | | |
05/01/1997 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
05/01/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/01/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/10/1997 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
03/24/1997 | Supplemental transcript filed | | |
03/21/1997 | Brief Due | | |
03/21/1997 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
02/14/1997 | Supplemental Transcript Due | | |
02/03/1997 | Brief Due | | |
01/23/1997 | Motion to supplement record disposed | Grant motion | |
01/09/1997 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
12/19/1996 | Brief Due | | |
12/18/1996 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
12/09/1996 | Motion to supplement record | | |
11/14/1996 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
11/04/1996 | Brief Due | | |
11/04/1996 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
10/10/1996 | Brief Due | | |
10/10/1996 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
10/10/1996 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
09/27/1996 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
09/19/1996 | Brief Due | | |
09/05/1996 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
08/23/1996 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
08/20/1996 | Brief Due | | |
08/08/1996 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
07/29/1996 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
07/21/1996 | Brief Due | | |
07/02/1996 | Record due | | |
06/21/1996 | Transcript filed | | |
06/06/1996 | Statement of facts filed | | |
05/06/1996 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
05/03/1996 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
04/29/1996 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | | |
04/19/1996 | Date judgment signed by trial judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/03/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
JACOBOWITZ, MICHAEL LEE | Criminal - Appellant | Cary Marshall Faden |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | John F. Healey Jr. John J. Harrity III |
Trial Court Information
268th District Court
Fort Bend
Honorable Brady G. Elliott
27488
60 yrs TDCJ