Case: 07-14-00036-CV
07-14-00036-CV
02/10/2014
Interlocutory
Flat Wireless, LLC
Cricket Communications, Inc. and Leap Wireless International, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/07/2014 | Sent to publisher | | |||||||
04/28/2014 | Sent to publisher | | |||||||
03/03/2014 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
03/03/2014 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
03/03/2014 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion Granted | | ||||||
02/28/2014 | Submitted | | |||||||
02/27/2014 | Motion to dismiss filed | | |||||||
02/27/2014 | Corrected document requested | | |||||||
02/24/2014 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||||
02/24/2014 | Motion for emergency relief disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||||
02/19/2014 | Reply to response or motion filed | | |||||||
02/18/2014 | Response filed | | |||||||
02/13/2014 | Response requested by the court |
| |||||||
02/12/2014 | Motion for emergency relief filed |
| |||||||
02/11/2014 | Corrected document requested | | |||||||
02/11/2014 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
02/11/2014 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
02/10/2014 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||||
02/10/2014 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
02/10/2014 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||||
02/06/2014 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
02/06/2014 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/03/2014 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Flat Wireless, LLC | Appellant | Jack McCutchin, Jr. Arlene C. Matthews Robert L. Duncan |
Cricket Communications | Appellee | John Simpson Thomas E. Pitts Benjamin Davidson William B. Dawson Benjamin Williams |
Leap Wireless International, Inc. | Appellee | William B. Dawson John Simpson |
Trial Court Information
72nd District Court
Lubbock
Honorable Ruben Gonzales Reyes
2014-504,776
Rebecca Layne Duval